U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00212
  • Case Name: Hawkins v. O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Trial Management Order]
  • May 15, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 15, 2025: [Pretrial Conference - Held]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 08, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 07, 2025: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
  • April 02, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.