U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cv-00401
  • Case Name: Gonzalez v. Adventure Enterprises, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • May 05, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order to Show Cause]
  • May 02, 2025: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
March, 2025
  • March 10, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.