U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-01004
  • Case Name: Duron v. Pilot Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • May 05, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 21, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 09, 2025: [Compel]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 31, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 25, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 24, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 19, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 17, 2025: [Extend (other)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 14, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • March 13, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 10, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.