U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00050
  • Case Name: Macias Tapia v. City of Hobbs et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Initial Scheduling Order]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Extend (other)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 11, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Summons Issued]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.