U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00666
  • Case Name: Foulds v. Werner Enterprises, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • May 08, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 22, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 12, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.