U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00678
  • Case Name: Bender Dealer Group, Inc. v. Brightline Dealer Advisors, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • April 22, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 16, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • April 14, 2025: [Errata]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 14, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.