U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00108
  • Case Name: Szantho v. Great Dane LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 07, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 29, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 25, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 25, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 25, 2025: [Joint Status Report (JSR)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Initial Scheduling Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.