U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-01028
  • Case Name: Langworthy v. Seidel et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Declaration]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • March 26, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 26, 2025: [Transmission of Preliminary Record to USCA]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Appeal]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
  • March 17, 2025: [Reopen Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.