U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of New York

new york Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of New York
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1-15-45288
  • Case Name: Nelson A. Cobos
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2016
  • February 20, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pereira, John S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing with Chapter 7 Discharge and Chapter 7 Final Decree]
  • February 18, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pereira, John S. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • February 18, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pereira, John S. [Discharging Debtor Ch7 and Final Decree Ch7]
January, 2016
  • January 11, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pereira, John S. [Debtor's Certificate of Financial Management and/or Form 423]
  • January 03, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pereira, John S. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
December, 2015
  • December 17, 2015: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pereira, John S. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds Collected]
  • December 07, 2015: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pereira, John S. [Debtor's Certificate of Financial Management and/or Form 423]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pereira, John S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 25, 2015: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pereira, John S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Electronic Filing]
  • November 23, 2015: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pereira, John S. [Request for Notice - Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • November 23, 2015: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pereira, John S. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • November 20, 2015: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pereira, John S. [Judge - Trustee - 341 Meeting Assignment (Chapter 7 No Asset) (Auto Assign)]
  • November 20, 2015: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pereira, John S. [Automatic docket of credit card/debit card]
  • November 20, 2015: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Automatic docket of credit card/debit card]
  • November 20, 2015: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pereira, John S. [Employee Income Records / Copies of Pay Statements]
  • November 20, 2015: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pereira, John S. [Pre-Petition Statement Pursuant to LR 2017-1]
  • November 20, 2015: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records / Copies of Pay Statements]
  • November 20, 2015: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Pre-Petition Statement Pursuant to LR 2017-1]
  • November 20, 2015: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pereira, John S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 20, 2015: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • November 20, 2015: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pereira, John S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • November 20, 2015: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.