Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of New York

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of New York
    Case Number:1:19-cv-00334
    Party Name:Fiallos et al v. New York City Department of Education
  • Filing Type:Civil [Counter Statement to Rule 56.1]
    Date Published:June 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Rule 56.1 Statement]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:May 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Electronic File]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Interlocutory Appeal]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply Memorandum of Law in Support (non-motion)]
    Date Published:March 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration in Opposition (non-motion)]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Opposition Brief]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:March 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:February 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:February 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum of Law in Support (non-motion)]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affirmation in Support (non-motion)]
    Date Published:February 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply (non-motion)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing Transcript]
    Date Published:January 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript]
    Date Published:January 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter]
    Date Published:January 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memo Endorsement]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Declaration in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:January 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:January 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:January 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:January 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Affidavit of Service Other]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued]
    Date Published:January 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request for Issuance of Summons]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet]
    Date Published:January 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?508220
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =