Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-12057
    Party Name:Gwendolyn Louise White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Eileen K [Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC]
    Date Published:June 07, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-12057
    Party Name:Gwendolyn Louise White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Eileen K [Copy of Photo ID]
    Date Published:June 05, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-12057
    Party Name:Gwendolyn Louise White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Eileen K [Notice of Photo ID Deficiency]
    Date Published:June 05, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-12057
    Party Name:Gwendolyn Louise White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Eileen K [Notice to Debtor]
    Date Published:June 05, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-12057
    Party Name:Gwendolyn Louise White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Eileen K [341 Meeting Issued after Auto Assign]
    Date Published:June 05, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-12057
    Party Name:Gwendolyn Louise White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Eileen K [Notice and Order Regarding Deficient Filing]
    Date Published:June 05, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-12057
    Party Name:Gwendolyn Louise White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Eileen K [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
    Date Published:June 05, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-12057
    Party Name:Gwendolyn Louise White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Eileen K [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:June 05, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-12057
    Party Name:Gwendolyn Louise White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Eileen K [Verification of Creditor Matrix]
    Date Published:June 05, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-12057
    Party Name:Gwendolyn Louise White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Eileen K [Statement of Social Security Number-Form 121]
    Date Published:June 05, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-12057
    Party Name:Gwendolyn Louise White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Eileen K [Certificate of Mailing - BNC]
    Date Published:June 04, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-12057
    Party Name:Gwendolyn Louise White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Eileen K [Request for Notice]
    Date Published:June 03, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-12057
    Party Name:Gwendolyn Louise White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Eileen K [Reassignment of Judge]
    Date Published:June 02, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-12057
    Party Name:Gwendolyn Louise White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Eileen K [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:June 02, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-12057
    Party Name:Gwendolyn Louise White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Field, Eileen K [Auto Assignment (7 No Asset)]
    Date Published:June 02, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-10082
    Party Name:Gwendolyn Louise White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Greenberger, Mark A. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:March 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-10082
    Party Name:Gwendolyn Louise White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Greenberger, Mark A. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
    Date Published:March 02, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-10082
    Party Name:Gwendolyn Louise White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Greenberger, Mark A. [Dismissing Debtor(s)]
    Date Published:March 01, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-10082
    Party Name:Gwendolyn Louise White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Greenberger, Mark A. [Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-10082
    Party Name:Gwendolyn Louise White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Greenberger, Mark A. [File]
    Date Published:January 31, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-10082
    Party Name:Gwendolyn Louise White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Greenberger, Mark A. [Certificate of Mailing - BNC]
    Date Published:January 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-10082
    Party Name:Gwendolyn Louise White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Greenberger, Mark A. [Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC]
    Date Published:January 14, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-10082
    Party Name:Gwendolyn Louise White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Greenberger, Mark A. [Notice to Debtor]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-10082
    Party Name:Gwendolyn Louise White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Greenberger, Mark A. [341 Meeting Issued after Auto Assign]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-10082
    Party Name:Gwendolyn Louise White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Greenberger, Mark A. [Notice and Order Regarding Deficient Filing]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-10082
    Party Name:Gwendolyn Louise White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Greenberger, Mark A. [Have Chapter 7 Filing Fee Waived]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-10082
    Party Name:Gwendolyn Louise White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Greenberger, Mark A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-10082
    Party Name:Gwendolyn Louise White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Greenberger, Mark A. [Statement of Social Security Number-Form 121]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-10082
    Party Name:Gwendolyn Louise White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Greenberger, Mark A. [Verification of Creditor Matrix]
    Date Published:January 12, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-10082
    Party Name:Gwendolyn Louise White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Greenberger, Mark A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:1:17-bk-10082
    Party Name:Gwendolyn Louise White
    Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Greenberger, Mark A. [Auto Assignment (7 No Asset)]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Source: https://ecf.ohsb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?741473

Post Your Comment or Question

5 x 2 =