Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio
    Case Number:2:19-cr-00012-1
    Party Name:USA v. Woolfork
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing ]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention ]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance ]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest ]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ohsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?220552
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =