open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio
    Case Number:3:19-cr-00067-JGC-1
    Party Name:United States of America v. Castellanos
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:June 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:March 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document ]
    Date Published:March 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:February 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.ohnd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?251173
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =