U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00071-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gomez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order of Reassignement/Recusal]
  • December 20, 2022: [Amend/Correct ]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Telephone Conference]
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 09, 2022: [Telephone Conference]
  • September 08, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • September 01, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 01, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 01, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 01, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 01, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 01, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 31, 2022: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.