U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00156-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Johnson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 17, 2023: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 13, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 12, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 10, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • January 06, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 05, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 20, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 07, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 30, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 04, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 03, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 03, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 26, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 24, 2022: [Discovery]
  • October 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 18, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 17, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 12, 2022: [Discovery]
  • September 12, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 08, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • September 08, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 06, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 06, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 02, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 31, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 31, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • August 24, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.