U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00490-BMB-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Sanchez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 09, 2023: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • September 12, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 01, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • September 01, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.