U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00468-JPC-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Simmons
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 20, 2023: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • August 30, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • August 30, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.