U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00516-JJH-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reebel
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Set Aside Verdict ]
  • March 28, 2025: [Acquittal ]
  • March 19, 2025: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Prepare Transcript]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [JERS Order]
  • October 07, 2024: [CJA 21 - Authorization to Pay ]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Minute Order - Pretrial Conference]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 06, 2022: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay ]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 16, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order]
  • September 12, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
  • September 12, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 12, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • September 09, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.