U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00177-DAP-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Felder
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 20, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 26, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 26, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 12, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.