U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00519-DAR-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Bush et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Designate Case Complex]
  • November 08, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 04, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Designate Case Complex]
  • November 03, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 01, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order]
  • November 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Referral]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 26, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Referral]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • October 21, 2022: [Hearing ]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • September 30, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • September 30, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 26, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • September 23, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • September 16, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.