U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00514-JJH-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gierhart
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Minute Order - Pretrial Conference]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 13, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order]
  • September 23, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
  • September 23, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 23, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • September 22, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.