U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00525-JPC-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bufford
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Forfeiture of Property ]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • September 28, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • September 27, 2022: [Revoke]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • September 23, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • September 23, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.