U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00182-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Omar
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 10, 2023: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 08, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 07, 2023: [Discovery]
  • January 07, 2023: [Appear]
  • January 04, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 04, 2023: [Arraignment ]
  • January 04, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order of Detention ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 29, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • December 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 29, 2022: [Pretrial Detention]
  • December 29, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • December 29, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act]
  • December 29, 2022: [Arrest ]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.