U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00106-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Medina-Feliz et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 17, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 03, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to File Document Under Seal]
  • November 28, 2022: [File Document Under Seal]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • November 14, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • November 07, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Bond]
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Telephone Conference]
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice Terminating Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 21, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • October 19, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • October 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 04, 2022: [Telephone Conference]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • October 04, 2022: [Pretrial Detention]
  • October 04, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order of Detention ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act]
  • October 04, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 04, 2022: [Regarding Use Of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 29, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 28, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 27, 2022: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.