U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00177-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brown, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 19, 2022: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 19, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act]
  • October 19, 2022: [Regarding Use Of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • October 19, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • October 19, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing ]
  • October 19, 2022: [Bond Hearing ]
  • October 19, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order]
  • October 14, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 14, 2022: [Waiver of Right to Appear in Person]
  • October 14, 2022: [Consent to Plead Guilty Before U.S. Magistrate Judge]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.