U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00573-DAR-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Lunato
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 04, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • November 04, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 04, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.