U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00601-BYP-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Fitts
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order]
  • December 13, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order]
  • November 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • November 04, 2022: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • November 04, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.