U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00605-PAB-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Katz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • December 13, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 04, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • October 27, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment ]
  • October 27, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • October 18, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.