U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00608-DCN-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Forshey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • January 11, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order Regarding Violation Report (Summons)]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order]
  • October 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.