U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00619-CEF-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Robinson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • January 13, 2023: [Bond ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • November 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • November 10, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • November 09, 2022: [Protective Order ]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order]
  • October 28, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.