U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-cr-00618-JRK-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Vanwoert
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 27, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Minute Order - Pretrial Conference]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • November 02, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 28, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.