U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00655-BYP-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Puszak
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 13, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 13, 2023: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • January 12, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order]
  • December 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.