U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00578-DAP-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Regarding Violation Report (Summons)]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util _ Terminate Motions]
  • April 04, 2025: [Early Termination of Probation]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order]
  • January 24, 2023: [CJA 23 - Financial Affidavit]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order Regarding Use of Video Conferencing/Teleconferencing]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.