U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00228-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Hall, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order of Reassignement/Recusal]
  • January 17, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 12, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 03, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 03, 2023: [Arraignment ]
  • January 03, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order of Detention ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • December 28, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 28, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.