U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00140-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Beltran-Hernandez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • May 14, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 09, 2025: [Due Process Protections Act]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order of Detention ]
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • May 09, 2025: [Pretrial Detention]
  • May 09, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • May 09, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 09, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 09, 2025: [Initial Appearance ]
  • May 09, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • May 09, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 21, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Reply (non motion)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 19, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 18, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.