U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Patton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 08, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • May 08, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 08, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 08, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 07, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Telephone Conference]
  • March 20, 2025: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.