U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00115-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Toombs et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 06, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.