U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garcia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 22, 2025: [Consent to Plead Guilty Before U.S. Magistrate Judge]
  • May 21, 2025: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 21, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 21, 2025: [Plea Agreement Hearing ]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 05, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • March 27, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.