U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hernandez-Garfia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • April 14, 2025: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 14, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 14, 2025: [Arraignment ]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 14, 2025: [Statement of Facts]
  • April 11, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.