U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00091-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Jackson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 13, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 07, 2025: [Judgment]
  • May 06, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 14, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 02, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.