U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00119-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Christian et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 08, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 08, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Telephone Conference]
  • April 09, 2025: [Status Conference ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.