U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of Ohio

ohio Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00193-DAR-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
  • May 14, 2025: [Travel ]
  • May 08, 2025: [Report and Recommendation on Guilty Plea]
  • May 08, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Referral]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 22, 2025: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.