open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

OKLAHOMA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:5:20-cr-00178-1
    Party Name:USA v. Grayson
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Jury Trial]
    Date Published:October 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:October 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Petition to Enter Plea of Guilty]
    Date Published:October 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:October 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:October 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:October 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Modifying Conditions of Supervision (12B)]
    Date Published:August 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request For Modifying Conditions Of Supervision (12B)]
    Date Published:October 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice from Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
    Date Published:February 19, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.okwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?92994
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =