Quantcast
open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:5:19-cr-00028-1
    Party Name:United States of America v. Pritchard
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Psychiatric Exam]
    Date Published:March 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Docket]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:February 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Detention Hearing & Order]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:February 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:February 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:February 06, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.okwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?105932
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =