open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:5:19-cv-00445
    Party Name:Brashear v. Board of County Commissioners of Oklahoma County et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
    Date Published:August 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Address Change]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:May 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss]
    Date Published:May 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Receipt]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:May 15, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.okwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?106889
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =