open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

OKLAHOMA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:5:19-cv-00736
    Party Name:Board of County Commissioners for Dewey County v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Docket Annotation]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Conditional Transfer Order]
    Date Published:August 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement - LLC]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Disclosure Statement - Corporate]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Payment for a Civil Case]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.okwd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?107777
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =