open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

OKLAHOMA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:20-12646
    Party Name:Sean KC Breeding
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manchester, Susan J. [CCC / FMC dates]
    Date Published:September 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manchester, Susan J. [(auto) Chapter 7 Trustee Report of No Distribution - no funds]
    Date Published:September 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manchester, Susan J. [Corrective Entry Satisfied]
    Date Published:August 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manchester, Susan J. [Corrective Entry]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manchester, Susan J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manchester, Susan J. [Verify Case - Chapter 7 Individual]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manchester, Susan J. [Pay the Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manchester, Susan J. [Incomplete PDF Image (bk)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Manchester, Susan J. [(auto) Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Pay the Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.okwb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?308379
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =