open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Oklahoma

OKLAHOMA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:20-80777
    Party Name:Allen Michael Stevens
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Greenough, Charles [Statement Adjourning Meeting of Creditors (Batch)]
    Date Published:September 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Greenough, Charles [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:September 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Greenough, Charles [Minute Entry/Hearing Continued]
    Date Published:September 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Greenough, Charles [Objection]
    Date Published:August 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Greenough, Charles [3-Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Greenough, Charles [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Greenough, Charles [Meeting of Creditors 7]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.okeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?86158
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =