open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Oklahoma

OKLAHOMA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Oklahoma
    Case Number:20-81002
    Party Name:Geri Lynn Davis
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, Gerald R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:October 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, Gerald R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:October 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, Gerald R. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:October 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, Gerald R. [Nunc Pro Tunc]
    Date Published:October 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, Gerald R. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (ADI)]
    Date Published:October 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, Gerald R. [Meeting of Creditors 7]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Miller, Gerald R. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments-Individuals]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments-Individuals]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.okeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?86386
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =