U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Oklahoma

oklahoma Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-00740
  • Case Name: Simmons v. Roth
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 21, 2025: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [Strike]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 12, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • November 07, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 01, 2022: [Response to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
  • February 01, 2022: [Extend Deadlines or Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Dismiss]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 22, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • December 22, 2021: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 21, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 21, 2021: [Summons Issued]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Payment for a Civil Case]
  • July 26, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.